Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Lexington

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Dec 1253AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
17 May 1254Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
8 Aug 1258DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Lexington
Bishop Henry Lexington (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNew Temple, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 60
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 11
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,572

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast