Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Krzysztof Kukulka, O.F.M. Conv.

Superior Emeritus of Uzbekistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1959 Born
1 Jun 198526.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
29 Sep 199738.6AppointedSuperior of Uzbekistan
1 Apr 200546.1ResignedSuperior of Uzbekistan

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Kukulka (VIAF: 5501147270516435700005)
Father Krzysztof Kukulka O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Superior Emeritus of Uzbekistan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaworzyna Slaska, Poland

Please contact the Father through the Apostolic Administration of Uzbekistan.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast