Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Krewel, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1439AppointedBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia
17 Nov 1443Ordained BishopBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia
23 Sep 1454DiedBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia

MicroData Summary for Johann Krewel
Bishop Johann Krewel O.T. (died ) Bishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne]

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,752

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Jul 2021

Quantcast