Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel O’Kearney

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Nov 1759SelectedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
27 Nov 1759ConfirmedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
27 Jan 1760Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
24 Jan 1778DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Daniel O’Kearney
Bishop Daniel O’Kearney (died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick
Buried Place (Original)St. John's churchyard

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 262
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 39
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast