Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geoffroi Isnard

Deceased

Bishop of Riez, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Apr 1322AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
17 Aug 1334AppointedBishop of Riez, France
26 Jul 1348DiedBishop of Riez, France

MicroData Summary for Geoffroi Isnard
Bishop Geoffroi Isnard (died ) Bishop of Riez

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 417, and Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Mar 2021

Quantcast