Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlos Eugenio Irarrázaval Errázuriz

Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1966 Born
12 Aug 199529.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
18 May 199630.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
22 May 201953.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santiago de Chile
22 May 201953.1AppointedTitular Bishop-Elect of Tanudaia
14 Jun 201953.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santiago de Chile
14 Jun 201953.1ResignedTitular Bishop-Elect of Tanudaia

MicroData Summary for Carlos Eugenio Irarrázaval Errázuriz
Father Carlos Eugenio Irarrázaval Errázuriz (born ) Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2019
  • od/c01: CB, 22 May 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast