Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John de Innes

Deceased

Bishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jan 1407AppointedBishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain
23 Jan 1407Ordained BishopBishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Apr 1414DiedBishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John de Innes
Bishop John de Innes (died ) Bishop of Moray

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 350
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Number 7,968

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Nov 2020

Quantcast