Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Dolores Grullón Estrella

Bishop Emeritus of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1942 Born
13 Dec 197028.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 199149.0AppointedBishop of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic
22 Jun 199149.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic
7 Nov 202078.8RetiredBishop of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for José Dolores Grullón Estrella
Bishop José Dolores Grullón Estrella (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Juan de la Maguana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de los Caballeros
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Stade des sports, San Juan de la Maguana, Diocese of San Juan de la Maguana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Juan de la Maguana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,545
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Sep 2021

Quantcast