Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo del Grasso, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534¹Born
14 Jul 157440.5AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
14 Nov 157440.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
15 Apr 158955.2DiedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo del Grasso
Bishop Paolo del Grasso C.R.L. (born 1534, died ) Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna, Italy
Ordained BishopDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Giovanni in Monte, Monastery, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna, Italy

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/d/c2: CB, 16 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,094
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 162
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,019
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: AT, 19 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Feb 2021

Quantcast