Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Goyon

Deceased

Bishop of Luçon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Mar 1422AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
28 Jun 1424AppointedBishop of Luçon, France
26 Mar 1431DiedBishop of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Goyon
Bishop Guillaume de Goyon (died ) Bishop of Luçon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 315, and Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast