Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Miguel Godoy Herrera

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá, Chile

Priest of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1865Born
20 Sep 189025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
15 Dec 192560.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
10 Aug 192661.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
12 Nov 194580.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá, Chile

MicroData Summary for José Miguel Godoy Herrera
Father José Miguel Godoy Herrera (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalagante

  • a priest for 55.1 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Apr 2021

Quantcast