Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni

Deceased

Bishop of Orte, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: Karminen


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Oct 1356AppointedBishop
9 Aug 1361AppointedBishop of Kisamos (Cisamo), Greece
25 Jul 1363AppointedBishop of Orte, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni
Bishop Giovanni , Bishop of Orte

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 279, and Page 185
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jul 2021

Quantcast