Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro de Giorgi

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Mar 1394AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
15 Feb 1413AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
4 Nov 1429AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro de Giorgi
Archbishop Pietro de Giorgi , Archbishop of Genova

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 476, and Page 372
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jul 2021

Quantcast