Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomeo Gattola

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jan 1406AppointedBishop of Rossano, Italy
14 Nov 1421AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
14 Oct 1426AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
1446²DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Gattola
Archbishop Bartolomeo Gattola (died 1446) Archbishop of Messina

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 337, and Page 418
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 424
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Jul 2021

Quantcast