Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloisio Gandolfi, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Syria, Egypt, Arabia, and Cyprus, Syria

Titular Bishop of Icosium


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Aug 1815AppointedTitular Bishop of Icosium
11 Aug 1815AppointedApostolic Delegate to Syria
28 Jul 1816Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Icosium
13 Jan 1818AppointedVicar Apostolic of Syria, Egypt, Arabia, and Cyprus, Syria
10 Aug 1825DiedVicar Apostolic of Syria, Egypt, Arabia, and Cyprus, Syria

MicroData Summary for Aloisio Gandolfi
Bishop Aloisio Gandolfi C.M. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Syria, Egypt, Arabia, and Cyprus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondovi, Italy

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Apr 2021

Quantcast