Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni da Gallinaro, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
22 May 1350AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
14 Mar 1373AppointedBishop of Rossano, Italy
16 May 1373AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
2 Jul 1382AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni da Gallinaro
Bishop Giovanni da Gallinaro O.F.M. , Bishop of Tricarico

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 424, and Page 346
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 497, and Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jun 2021

Quantcast