Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Cardinal da Frignano, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

Administrator of Grado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1305¹Born
19 Jul 137267.5AppointedPatriarch of Grado, Italy
18 Sep 137873.7AppointedAdministrator of Grado, Italy
18 Sep 137873.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Sep 137873.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
30 May 138075.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
19 Nov 138176.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso da Frignano
Tommaso Cardinal da Frignano O.F.M. (born 1305, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena
Death PlaceS. Maria in Aracoeli, Convent, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Aracoeli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jul 2021

Quantcast