Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Foix (Sr.), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Administrator of Lescar, France

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Administrator of Tarbes

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1386²Born
23 Oct 140923.8AppointedBishop of Lescar, France
Sep 1414³28.6AppointedAdministrator of Lescar, France
Sep 1414³28.6Elevated to Cardinal
1417²31.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
7 Aug 142236.5AppointedAdministrator of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
14 Mar 143145.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
9 Nov 143246.8AppointedAdministrator of Mirepoix, France
26 Jan 143347.0AppointedAdministrator of Lescar, France
Jul 1433³47.5ResignedAdministrator of Mirepoix, France
25 Sep 145064.7AppointedAdministrator of Arles, France
5 Jul 145165.5AppointedAdministrator of Acqs (Dax), France
30 May 145973.4ResignedAdministrator of Acqs (Dax), France
11 Feb 146377.1AppointedAdministrator of Tarbes, France
24 Mar 146377.2ResignedAdministrator of Arles, France
13 Dec 146478.9DiedAdministrator of Lescar, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Foix (Sr.) (VIAF: 100201166)
Pierre Cardinal de Foix (Sr.) O.F.M. (born 1386, died ) Administrator of Lescar

EventPlace
Birth Place
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Franciscans (Cordeliers), Church, Avignon

  • a cardinal for 50.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, Sep 1414
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 93
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 310, and Page 295
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Mar 2021

Quantcast