Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Fleury, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Luçon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Aug 1412AppointedBishop of Angoulême, France
13 Jul 1431AppointedBishop of Luçon, France
17 Oct 1441DiedBishop of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Fleury
Bishop Jean Fleury O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Luçon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 181
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast