Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Firmoni (Grimaldi)

Deceased

Bishop of Fermo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jan 1388AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
29 Oct 1394AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
22 Jan 1406AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
20 Jun 1412AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Firmoni (Grimaldi)
Bishop Giovanni Firmoni (Grimaldi) , Bishop of Fermo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 447, and Page 434
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 111, and Page 250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jun 2021

Quantcast