Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre de Ferrières

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1299AppointedBishop of Lectoure, France
22 Dec 1301AppointedBishop of Noyon, France
30 Jan 1304AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
8 Nov 1307DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Ferrières
Archbishop Pierre de Ferrières (died ) Archbishop of Arles

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 372, and Page 103
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast