Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Louis Fan Luyi

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1920Born
19 Aug 195030.5Ordained PriestPriest
1992²71.9SelectedBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
1992¹71.9AppointedAdministrator of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
9 Jun 200484.3ResignedAdministrator of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
23 Mar 201696.1DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Fan Luyi
Father Louis Fan Luyi (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGangfangyingzi, Diocese of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]
Death PlaceQingshan

  • a priest for 65.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 9 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 10 Jan 2021

Quantcast