Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Enselmini

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Oct 1388AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
20 Mar 1392ResignedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
26 Aug 1392AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
1404¹DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Enselmini
Bishop Giovanni Enselmini (died 1404) Bishop of Adria

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 386, and Page 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast