Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean du Plessis-Pasté

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateEventTitle
21 May 1326AppointedBishop of Arras, France
23 Dec 1327AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
30 Mar 1332DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Jean du Plessis-Pasté
Bishop Jean du Plessis-Pasté (died ) Bishop of Chartres

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 167, and Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Mar 2021

Quantcast