Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Camillo de Romanis, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1885Born
25 Jul 190722.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
20 Aug 193752.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
5 Sep 193752.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
18 Jan 195064.8DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Camillo de Romanis
Bishop Alfonso Camillo de Romanis O.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenazzano, Italy

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1937, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 7 Dec 2020

Quantcast