Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis Cardinal de Luxembourg

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Administrator of Ely, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1390¹Born
2 Jan 141525.0SelectedBishop of Thérouanne, France
24 Nov 141828.8ConfirmedBishop of Thérouanne, France
19 Aug 143646.6SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
24 Oct 143646.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
27 Sep 143747.7AppointedAdministrator of Ely, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 143949.9Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 144050.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
Dec 1442²52.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
18 Sep 144353.7DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Louis de Luxembourg
Louis Cardinal de Luxembourg (born 1390, died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Birth Place
Death PlaceCastle, Hartfield, Great Britain
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Ely, Diocese of Ely, England, Great Britain

  • a cardinal for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 225, and Page 150
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 351
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 338
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 85
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,452
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Aug 2021

Quantcast