Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ludovico della Torre

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jun 1346AppointedBishop of Trieste, Italy
30 Mar 1349AppointedBishop of Olena, Greece
15 May 1357AppointedBishop of Coron (Coronea), Greece
10 May 1359AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
30 Jul 1365DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico della Torre
Patriarch Ludovico della Torre (died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 477, and Page 375
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 212, and Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 May 2021

Quantcast