Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito de Rivas, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Feb 1663SelectedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
4 Jun 1663ConfirmedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
24 Feb 1664Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
21 Aug 1668DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

MicroData Summary for Benito de Rivas
Bishop Benito de Rivas O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1,500, Page 197, Number 1,236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1664, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast