Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László de Deménd

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Feb 1367AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
27 Oct 1372AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
2 Oct 1377AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
1382¹DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for László de Deménd
Bishop László de Deménd (died 1382) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 524, and Page 515
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast