Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Orso Cardinal Delfino

Deceased

Patriarch of Grado, Italy

Administrator of Modon (Medone, Methone)


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1347AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
30 Mar 1349AppointedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
5 Nov 1361AppointedPatriarch of Grado, Italy
5 Nov 1361AppointedAdministrator of Candia {Crete}, Greece
1362²Elevated to Cardinal
6 Mar 1363AppointedAdministrator of Modon (Medone, Methone), Greece
4 Dec 1367DiedPatriarch of Grado, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orso Delfino
Orso Cardinal Delfino (died ) Patriarch of Grado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Diocese of Castello
Death PlaceVenezia, Diocese of Castello
Buried Place (Original)Servite, Church, Venezia, Diocese of Castello

  • a cardinal for 5.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 351, and Page 266
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 215, and Page 288
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1362

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Aug 2021

Quantcast