Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond de Bar

Deceased

Bishop of Montauban, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Oct 1399AppointedBishop of Gap, France
17 Dec 1404AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
26 Mar 1424DiedBishop of Montauban, France

MicroData Summary for Raymond de Bar
Bishop Raymond de Bar (died ) Bishop of Montauban

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 347, and Page 514

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Mar 2021

Quantcast