Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Cortecuisse

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1421AppointedBishop of Paris, France
12 Jun 1422AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
4 Mar 1423DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jean Cortecuisse
Bishop Jean Cortecuisse (died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 261, and Page 391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jul 2021

Quantcast