Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Corradi Pocciarelli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
25 May 1390AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
18 Aug 1402AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
14 Nov 1418DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Corradi Pocciarelli
Bishop Nicola Corradi Pocciarelli O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Segni

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 478, and Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jun 2021

Quantcast