Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William of Cornhill

Deceased

Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Aug 1214AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
25 Jan 1215Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
19 Aug 1223DiedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William of Cornhill
Bishop William of Cornhill (died ) Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield

EventPlace
Ordained BishopInfirmary, Chapel, Reading

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 54
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 546
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,796

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast