Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ubertino di Corleone, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1372AppointedTitular Bishop of Gorhigos (Coricos, Korghos)
28 Nov 1373AppointedBishop of Patti e Lipari, Italy
1386²RemovedBishop of Patti e Lipari, Italy
16 May 1390AppointedBishop of Patti e Lipari, Italy
18 Aug 1397AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
1399²DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ubertino di Corleone
Bishop Ubertino di Corleone O.F.M. (died 1399) Bishop of Gaeta

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 384, and Page 258
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Jul 2021

Quantcast