Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Willem (Guillaume) van Coudenberghes (Cordemberghe)

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jul 1385Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
14 Mar 1386AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
19 Aug 1393AppointedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
17 Mar 1399AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Willem (Guillaume) van Coudenberghes (Cordemberghe)
Bishop Willem (Guillaume) van Coudenberghes (Cordemberghe) , Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHadham

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 490, and Page 130
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,586
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,824

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast