Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luis Felipe Contardo Palma

Deceased

Ecclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Chillán, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1880Born
6 Sep 190323.0Ordained PriestPriest
1921²40.3AppointedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Chillán, Chile
9 Mar 192241.5DiedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Chillán, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Felipe Contardo Palma
Father Luis Felipe Contardo Palma (born , died ) Ecclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Chillán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolina
Death PlaceChillán, Diocese of Chillán

  • a priest for 18.5 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Mar 2021

Quantcast