Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Codoni (di San Girolamo)

Deceased

Bishop of Ceneda, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Dec 1363AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
19 Dec 1373AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
11 Jan 1378AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Codoni (di San Girolamo)
Bishop Andrea Codoni (di San Girolamo) , Bishop of Ceneda

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 536, and Page 497
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast