Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano da Civita Castellana, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Aug 1403AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
7 Jul 1406AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana, Italy
17 Apr 1414DiedBishop of Civita Castellana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano da Civita Castellana
Bishop Stefano da Civita Castellana O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 484, and Page 190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 May 2021

Quantcast