Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-Alexis Chambon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yokohama, Japan

Titular Archbishop of Amorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1875Born
23 Sep 189924.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
16 Mar 192751.9AppointedArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
4 May 192752.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
9 Nov 193762.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Yokohama, Japan
12 Nov 194065.6ResignedBishop of Yokohama, Japan
12 Nov 194065.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amorium
8 Sep 194873.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Yokohama, Japan

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Alexis Chambon
Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-Alexis Chambon M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yokohama

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallore-Ville, France

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1927, Number 22
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 18, Number 962, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast