Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni di Castello

Deceased

Bishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Apr 1479AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
27 Jan 1486AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
10 May 1486AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
1501¹DiedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Giovanni di Castello
Bishop Giovanni di Castello (died 1501) Bishop of Carinola (Calina)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 236, and Page 242
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 114
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1479, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast