Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferry Cassinel

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1375AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
17 Oct 1382AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
29 Jan 1390AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
26 May 1390DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Ferry Cassinel
Archbishop Ferry Cassinel (died ) Archbishop of Reims

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 419, and Page 120
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Feb 2021

Quantcast