Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino Carnota

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Feb 1414AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
7 May 1423AppointedBishop of Trogir (Trał), Croatia
11 Dec 1424AppointedBishop of Trieste, Italy
1441²DiedBishop of Trieste, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marino Carnota
Bishop Marino Carnota (died 1441) Bishop of Trieste

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 490, and Page 477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 101
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 May 2021

Quantcast