Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Galhard de Carceribus

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Aug 1344AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
2 Mar 1345AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
19 Jul 1346AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
1348¹DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Galhard de Carceribus
Archbishop Galhard de Carceribus (died 1348) Archbishop of Brindisi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 179, and Page 523
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Apr 2021

Quantcast