Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Capranica

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1420AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
16 Jun 1427AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
31 Dec 1428DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Capranica
Archbishop Paolo Capranica (died ) Archbishop of Benevento

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 235, and Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Mar 2021

Quantcast