Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albrecht von Buxhoevden

Deceased

Bishop of Riga, Latvia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1165²Born
1198²33.0AppointedBishop of xkll (Uxhall, Ikšķile), Latvia
29 Mar 119934.2Ordained BishopBishop of xkll (Uxhall, Ikšķile), Latvia
17 Jan 122964.0DiedBishop of Riga, Latvia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Albrecht von Buxhoevden (VIAF: 285074858)
Bishop Albrecht von Buxhoevden (born 1165, died ) Bishop of Riga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBexhovede

  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 420
  • ob/c2: CB, 5 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Jul 2021

Quantcast