Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea dei Benzi di Gualdo (Brenti)

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Titular Archbishop of Symbalia (Cembalo, Balaclawa)


Events

DateEventTitle
29 May 1389AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
1403²AppointedTitular Archbishop of Samaria
1405¹AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
4 Jan 1413AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
6 Jun 1418AppointedAdministrator of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
1419¹AppointedTitular Archbishop of Symbalia (Cembalo, Balaclawa)
20 Apr 1431AppointedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
17 Apr 1437DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea dei Benzi di Gualdo (Brenti)
Archbishop Andrea dei Benzi di Gualdo (Brenti) (died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 197, and Page 470
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 459, and Page 432
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 482, and Page 442
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Jun 2021

Quantcast