Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Charles Edmund Boyce

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Monrovia, Liberia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1964¹Born
15 Aug 199026.6Ordained PriestPriest of Monrovia, Liberia
7 Jun 202157.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Monrovia, Liberia
19 Sep 202157.7DiedApostolic Administrator of Monrovia, Liberia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Edmund Boyce
Father Charles Edmund Boyce (born 1964, died ) Apostolic Administrator of Monrovia

  • a priest for 31.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Sep 2021

Quantcast