Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pietro Bovati, S.J.

Secretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Biblical Commission

Priest of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1940 Born
21 Oct 195919.3EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
3 Jul 197131.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Dec 201474.5AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Biblical Commission
2020²79.5RetiredSecretary of the Pontifical Biblical Commission

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Bovati (VIAF: 91948077)
Father Pietro Bovati S.J. (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Pontifical Biblical Commission

Please contact the Father through the Pontifical Biblical Commission.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2014
  • r.implied: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Apr 2021

Quantcast