Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bongiovanni

Deceased

Archbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece

Note/Previous Titular See: all same person?


Events

DateEventTitle
1285¹AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
13 Dec 1285Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
1312²AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
1348¹AppointedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna, Diacovar, Diakovar), Croatia
28 Jan 1349AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy
5 Apr 1363AppointedArchbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece
Jun 1363²DiedArchbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bongiovanni
Archbishop Bongiovanni (died Jun 1363) Archbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras)

  • a bishop for 77.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 394, and Page 249
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 142, and Page 111
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 518

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Aug 2021

Quantcast